MARY JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR WIDOWS

Charity number: 225628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity continues to distribute the funds to the widows of the Parishes. At Christmas and on when becoming widowed funding is given to the widows.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 19 June 2024

Total income: £3,340
Total expenditure: £3,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Troughton Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Lee Mckee Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Rev PAUL KERRY Trustee 05 December 2015
None on record
Melanie Ryden Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
Lesley Coward Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record
Hazel McGuirk Trustee 30 November 2004
None on record
ann ostle Trustee 06 November 1990
None on record
SHARON ROGAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/06/2020 19/06/2021 19/06/2022 19/06/2023 19/06/2024
Total gross income £3.15k £3.21k £3.29k £3.34k £3.34k
Total expenditure £3.28k £2.70k £2.65k £3.20k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 June 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 June 2020 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FERN COTTAGE
PARTON
WHITEHAVEN
CUMBRIA
CUMBRIA
CA28 4PA
Phone:
0194666919
Website:

No information available