Trustees MARY JACKSON'S CHARITY FOR WIDOWS
Charity number: 225628

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Troughton | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Mckee | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev PAUL KERRY | Trustee | 05 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ryden | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Coward | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel McGuirk | Trustee | 30 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
ann ostle | Trustee | 06 November 1990 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ROGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.