TICKHILL UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty within the Parishes of Tickhill and Stainton, Doncaster, South Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Doncaster
Governance
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
- 05 January 1996: Removed
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN HILL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
REV PAUL RICHARDSON | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||||||
LINDA JANET MAYES | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
JUDITH PATRICIA BLACK | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ELAINE MILLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN MICHAEL HORRIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.33k | £3.62k | £2.43k | £2.54k | £2.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £2.40k | £3.80k | £3.43k | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 JANUARY 1974
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF TICKHILL
Linked charities
- 16 October 1963 : Standard registration
- 05 January 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEAHURST, 50 SUNDERLAND STREET
TICKHILL
DONCASTER
DN11 9QJ
- Phone:
- 01302744842
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window