CERNE ABBAS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cerne Abbas Village Hall is the focus for the many and varied activities enjoyed by the local community. It provides a modern and well-equipped facility which is used by all local clubs and societies and for many indoor sporting and fitness activities. It is used by all sections of the community and is indispensible for the maintenance of a strong and active local community spirit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Millar Dunnet | Chair | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARTIN SPRING | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Paul | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Lawrence Lee | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA BERESFORD | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN STILL | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.03k | £21.45k | £25.64k | £24.59k | £28.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.58k | £22.05k | £18.23k | £40.05k | £34.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 5TH JULY 1938 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE 14TH JANUARY 1980
Charitable objects
THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVEELOPMENT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CERNE ABBAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Abbots Walk
Cerne Abbas
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT2 7JN
- Phone:
- 01300341396
- Email:
- gcmortimer@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window