Financial history THRALE ALMSHOUSE AND RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 225709
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £163.27k £186.76k £190.90k £208.67k £232.19k
Total expenditure £105.07k £131.08k £70.62k £95.11k £201.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A