Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TAMWORTH HOSPITALS

Charity number: 225715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/03/2020 10/03/2021 10/03/2022 10/03/2023 10/03/2024
Total gross income £19.00k £4.05k £1.50k £4.84k £4.33k
Total expenditure £12.27k £160 £615 £2.79k £7.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A