LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TAMWORTH HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds - eg -Fayres, quizzes, coffee mornings, raffles, and also ask the public to support the LoF by arranging events to sraise money for the LoF. All proceeds are used provide items for service users at the Tamworth hospitals - i.e. Sir Robert Peel Hospital and the George Bryan Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 06 February 1964: Standard registration
- 09 December 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Kenneth Smith | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger William Jackson | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Molloy Mrs | Trustee | 13 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Archer | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan O'Brien | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Beames | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Alldritt Treasurer | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Airdrie | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Kingsley | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Hoey | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jean Jackson Mrs | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samuel John Ellicott | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/03/2020 | 10/03/2021 | 10/03/2022 | 10/03/2023 | 10/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.00k | £4.05k | £1.50k | £4.84k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.27k | £160 | £615 | £2.79k | £7.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 March 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF 2/2/1950 AMENDED 16/11/1959.
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE TAMWORTH HOSPITALS AND TO PRVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING IN SUCH MANNER AS THE LEAGUE THINKS FIT THE RESOURCES OF THE HOSPITAL SERVICE. (SEE PARA. 3 OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
TAMWORTH AND DISTRACT
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Juniper
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B77 4ND
- Phone:
- 01827 735832
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window