WALKER MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Walker Memorial Hall is a community centre providing space for cultural, social and sporting activities for the population of Aldbrough St. John and nearby settlements of Carlton and Stanwick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Darlington
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 June 1965: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE HALL ALDBROUGH ST JOHN (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Newman | Chair | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Cook | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Tweedy | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Joyce Turner | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rowett | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Fraser Hall | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Riley-Fox | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Anne Victoria Young | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.05k | £11.38k | £4.00k | £9.43k | £14.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.33k | £3.15k | £9.94k | £22.18k | £19.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27041964
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION ROOM FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALDBOROUGH ST. JOHN AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
ALDBROUGH ST. JOHN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harthorn Barn
Aldbrough St John
Richmond
North Yorkshire
DL11 7SL
- Phone:
- 01325 374715
- Email:
- carolyn@harthornbarn.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window