Accounts and annual returns THE GLAMORGAN MISSION TO THE DEAF

Charity number: 225750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 September 2024 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required