Financial history THE GLAMORGAN MISSION TO THE DEAF

Charity number: 225750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.43k £18.48k £15.75k £37.80k £28.99k
Total expenditure £16.85k £20.21k £15.15k £42.71k £28.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A