Financial history CAPRICORN AFRICA TRUST

Charity Number: 225755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £169.58k £19.56k £17.30k £15.42k £14.98k
Total expenditure £66.58k £64.42k £65.16k £61.51k £111.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A