GULWORTHY PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a hall with kitchen facilities and toilets. This is used by the local community, school, WI, weddings, parties and numerous other organisations. This benefits children, adults, the elderly and the disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 27 September 1963: Standard registration
- GULWORTHY PARISH ROOM (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean May Osborne | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Daniel | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Trier | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Osborne | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Joy Steer | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Daniel | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Chalcraft | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.29k | £23.02k | £18.88k | £24.66k | £9.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.22k | £2.82k | £7.42k | £5.97k | £6.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £21.00k | £11.78k | £2.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30TH APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL TAVISTOCK (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, TAVISTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
GULWORTHY FARM
TAVISTOCK
PL19 8JQ
- Phone:
- 01822832400
- Email:
- lizzie.chalcraft@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window