Governing document PENNY POT (CLACTON) LIMITED
Charity Number: 225767
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1950 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 24 JUNE 1970, 9 MARCH 1982, 22 MARCH 1983,10 FEBRUARY 1987, 29 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 5 JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
A RESIDENTIAL HOME OR HOMES FOR ELDERLY PERSONS WITH LIMITED MEANS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.