Trustees GASKELL MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL, SILVERDALE
Charity number: 225842

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MOON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Steph Knowles | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Cairns | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Curzon | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Beaton | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Unsworth | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Broadhurst | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank Cranmer | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Reed | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clay | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Humphrey | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jim Ferguson | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Sharples | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.