Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM ARNOLD HOMES

Charity Number: 225845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 April 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required