JOHN AND NATHANIEL CARTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was established by the Will of John Carter dated 1696, to provide for his poor kindred forever.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
Governance
- 25 September 1963: Standard registration
- CARTERS TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Paul Myers | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Grant | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Xian Catmull | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Geoffrey Freeman | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
CLARE ELIZABETH ELKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.57k | £34.79k | £31.44k | £34.19k | £41.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.19k | £34.33k | £34.03k | £31.07k | £33.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2021 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1879. AND SCHEME OF 12 JULY,1974. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22 APR 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF THE POOR KINDRED OF JOHN CARTER AND NATHANIEL CARTER; AND 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE IN NEED THAT ARE RESIDING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BEING THE COUNTIES OF NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK BY MAKING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS AND BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norwich Community Action
New Hope Christian Centre
2 Martineau Lane
NORWICH
NR1 2HX
- Phone:
- 01603617771
- Email:
- welcome@carterstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window