VOLUNTARY ACTION - LEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary Action Leeds is the Council for Voluntary Service in Leeds. For 60 years we have been providing innovative and direct support, services and specialist advice to hundreds of voluntary and community groups, enabling them to carry out their work across Leeds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,543,506
Donations and legacies | £825 | |
Charitable activities | £177.16k | |
Other trading activities | £271.43k | |
Investments | £40.78k | |
Other | £2.05m |
Total expenditure:
£2,851,766
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£11,347 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,275,858 from 10 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.85m |
People

25 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 14 January 1964: Standard registration
- 21 July 1998: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- V A L (Working name)
- VAL (Working name)
- VOLUNTARY ACTION LEEDS (Working name)
- LEEDS COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- LEEDS COUNCIL OF SOCIAL SERVICE INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Rogers | Chair | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Zoobin Surty | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Guilaine Brutus | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Tangen | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Jose | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Li | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Andrea Marie Edwards | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Holmes | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Tomlin | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Lindsey Topham-Whitton | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Londo | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Claudie Ineson | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Audrey Evers | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ADRIAN NICHOLAS CURTIS | Trustee | 15 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
PAUL LANDEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £991.77k | £1.34m | £1.42m | £2.54m | £2.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £937.84k | £1.15m | £1.37m | £2.26m | £2.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £347.02k | £425.70k | £425.46k | £1.36m | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.77k | £4.33k | £1.24k | £925 | £825 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £185.57k | £200.32k | £224.26k | £271.43k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £958.12k | £251.71k | £252.54k | £171.60k | £177.16k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.87k | £4.69k | £4.53k | £20.97k | £40.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £891.85k | £966.03k | £2.12m | £2.05m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £937.84k | £1.15m | £1.37m | £2.26m | £2.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £10.00k | £10.00k | £11.97k | £10.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £388.28k | £384.97k | £505.49k | £496.23k | £486.15k | |
|
Long-term investments | £58.40k | £67.12k | £208.50k | £209.66k | £228.81k | |
|
Other assets | £651.69k | £1.28m | £1.51m | £1.67m | £1.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£36.56k | -£30.86k | -£2.64k | -£1.68k | -£785 | |
|
Total liabilities | £126.57k | £527.01k | £900.58k | £806.79k | £772.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEP 1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUNE 1974 AND CERT. OF INC (CHANGE OF NAME) 4 JULY 1988 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 AUG 1994, 11 NOV 1999 AND 19 NOV 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE SOCIAL SERVICE AND ALL OR ANY PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF LEEDS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION, THE FURTHERING OF HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECT WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
LEEDS
Linked charities
- 14 January 1964 : Standard registration
- 21 July 1998 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
VOLUNTARY ACTION
STRINGER HOUSE
34 LUPTON STREET
LEEDS
LS10 2QW
- Phone:
- 01132977920
- Email:
- info@val.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window