STEPHEN CAWOOD

Charity Number: 225864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The fund provides for payments:- to the vicar of St. Stephens, East Hardwick. To the Parish of Ackworth via Ackworth United Charities. To the Parish of East Hardwick. To the upkeep of St. Stephens Church East Hardwick. To the Educational Foundation of Stephen Cawood (529258).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 18 February 2024

Total income: £2,002
Total expenditure: £6,171

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE STEPHEN CAWOOD TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROY DONALDSON Chair
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
Elizabeth Spurdens Trustee 27 November 2017
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
ANDREW LAGDEN Trustee 06 November 2011
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
NICHOLAS DANDO Trustee 06 November 2011
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
SUSAN DONALDSON Trustee
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
ANNE STARK Trustee
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
STEVE SYKES Trustee
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time
ALF TAYLOR Trustee
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF STEPHEN CAWOOD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/02/2020 18/02/2021 18/02/2022 18/02/2023 18/02/2024
Total gross income £1.82k £1.85k £1.88k £1.93k £2.00k
Total expenditure £1.34k £1.05k £697 £1.44k £6.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 February 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2020 23 March 2021 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 SEPTEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
(1) PAYMENT TO THE VICAR OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN, EAST HARDWICK; (2) PAYMENT TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL TOWARDS THE COST OF REPAIRING THE PARISH CHURCH; (3) PAYMENT TO THE CAWOOD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ACKWORTH
Registration history
  • 06 March 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
IONA
DARRINGTON ROAD
EAST HARDWICK
WF8 3DS
Phone:
01977704086
Website:

No information available