JNF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JNF UK is an organisation raising funds for environmental and humanitarian causes in Israel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£19,347,000
Donations and legacies | £7.23m | |
Charitable activities | £10.86m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.25m | |
Other | £1.00k |
Total expenditure:
£17,987,000
Raising funds | £1.56m | |
Charitable activities | £16.43m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.56m | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.43m | |
Retained for future use | £1.36m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.56m | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.43m | |
Retained for future use | £1.36m |
People

26 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 June 1963: Standard registration
- 28 January 2021: Funds received from 1003951 KOHN FOUNDATION
- J N F CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- J.N.F. CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- JNF UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMUEL HAYEK | Chair |
|
||||||||
Roy Freedman | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Cathya Djanogly | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Belinda Jane Oakland | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy James Kendal | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Laurence Jeffrey Julius | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alan Mendoza | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|||||||
HOWARD NORMAN WAYNE | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Gideon Falter | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
MURRAY LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARILYN WAISMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.51m | £15.41m | £14.13m | £15.74m | £19.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42m | £6.78m | £16.92m | £14.29m | £17.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £84.00k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.40m | £6.09m | £4.89m | £5.69m | £7.23m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.63m | £8.71m | £8.66m | £9.16m | £10.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £466.00k | £453.00k | £575.00k | £883.00k | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Other | £9.00k | £158.00k | £7.00k | £8.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.60m | £3.82m | £1.90m | £4.15m | £2.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £15.65m | £5.06m | £15.58m | £12.58m | £16.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.76m | £1.72m | £1.34m | £1.71m | £1.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £55.00k | £119.00k | £103.00k | £0 | £86.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £167.00k | £191.00k | £1.41m | £1.54m | £2.68m | |
|
Long-term investments | £18.78m | £22.50m | £33.02m | £32.83m | £33.63m | |
|
Other assets | £25.67m | £22.69m | £16.17m | £18.70m | £16.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £13.95m | £6.08m | £8.12m | £9.12m | £7.73m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/07/1939 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/12/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/12/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/2015 as amended on 01 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE WITHIN THE STATE OF ISRAEL OF ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES, BEING CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POPULATION OF THE STATE OF ISRAEL, NAMELY: 3.1 THE PREVENTION OF RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR OTHER FORMS OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS WHO ARE IN NEED OR AT RISK OF FALLING INTO POVERTY, EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 3.2 TO ADVANCE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH, AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND INFIRMITY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION, JEWISH BELIEFS AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION (INCLUDING SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION OF JEWISH CULTURE, HISTORY, PRACTICES AND BELIEFS). 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN SPECIFIC AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.4.1 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 3.4.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.4.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.4.4 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.4.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.4.6 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; 3.4.7 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.4.8 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.4.9 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, INCLUDING PARKS, FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.4.10 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.4.11 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; AND/OR 3.4.12 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME. 3.5 TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3.6 TO ACT AS A RESOURCE BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND BY ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: 3.6.1 ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3.6.2 RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; AND 3.6.3 PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS AND/OR FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN SPECIAL NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. 3.7 TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY AND SOCIAL COHESION BY: 3.7.1 CREATING AND MAKING AVAILABLE SPACES, BOTH COVERED AND OPEN, FOR CONSTRUCTIVE INTERACTION; 3.7.2 ORGANISING AND PROMOTING PROGRAMMES FOR CONSTRUCTIVE INTERACTION; 3.7.3 PROMOTING FAITH AND INTERFAITH PROJECTS WHICH ARE CONDUCIVE TO SOCIAL COHESION; AND 3.7.4 RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ?SOCIALLY EXCLUDED? MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 3.8 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PLANTING TREES, BUILDING AND CREATING PARKS, AND PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. 3.9 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY: 3.9.1 THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; 3.9.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND 3.9.3 THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. IN THIS CLAUSE ?SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT? MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. 3.10 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 3.11 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
STATE OF ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
JNF Charitable Trust
95 Church Road
LONDON
NW4 4FE
- Phone:
- 020 8732 6124
- Email:
- info@jnf.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window