BUTTERFIELD HOMES (WILSDEN)

Charity number: 225965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Housing for elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £29,493
Total expenditure: £20,252

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark William Silver Chair 17 January 2014
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES,CROSSHILLS
Received: On time
Susan Sedgwick Trustee 16 February 2024
BUTTERFIELD HOMES,CROSSHILLS
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time
Simon Callaghan Trustee 16 February 2024
BUTTERFIELD HOMES,CROSSHILLS
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time
Peter Earp Trustee 04 November 2021
COTTINGLEY TOWN HALL CHURCH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES,CROSSHILLS
Received: On time
Alistair George Docherty Trustee 05 September 2019
BUTTERFIELD HOMES,CROSSHILLS
Received: On time
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time
ALBERT PRATT Trustee
BUTTERFIELD HOMES -(COTTINGLEY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.99k £34.01k £33.07k £32.92k £29.49k
Total expenditure £19.95k £14.16k £14.91k £26.26k £20.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Farndale Road
Wilsden
BRADFORD
West Yorkshire
BD15 0LW
Phone:
01535272657
Website:

No information available