THE MAYOR'S LAND CHARITY

Charity Number: 226024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024

Total income: £1,765
Total expenditure: £1,986

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Councillor Jane Elizabeth Brophy Trustee 30 January 2025
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Rev. Dr. Andrew William Knight Trustee 30 January 2025
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Councillor Dolores O'Sullivan Trustee 01 June 2022
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Stephen Walker Trustee 04 July 2019
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Dylan Butt Trustee 14 June 2018
DRILL HALL CHARITY AT STRETFORD ROAD, MANCHESTER
Received: On time
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
Peter Arthur Napier Christie Trustee 24 September 2014
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
MR N HOWARTH Trustee 30 December 2012
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
MR J H MULHOLLAND Trustee
NEWTOWN NIGHT SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £1.80k £1.75k £1.67k £1.66k £1.77k
Total expenditure £1.52k £2.54k £2.44k £2.64k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2023 24 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
83 Stamford Road
Bowdon
Altrincham
WA14 2JJ
Phone:
01619281894
Website:

No information available