Financial history THE TYNE LIFE-BOAT SOCIETY

Charity number: 226098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £831 £533 £436 £629 £539
Total expenditure £63 £13 £13 £13 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A