THE MABEL NOBLE HOMES

Charity Number: 226125
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide almshouse accomodation for poor widows and of good character.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 10 December 2023

Total income: £15,087
Total expenditure: £10,094

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 September 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MABEL NOBLE HOMES TRUST (Working name)
  • THE MABEL NOBLE HOMES AT UPPER POPPLETON IN THE WEST RIDING OF THE COUNTY OF YORK (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Richard Kendall Trustee 19 December 2023
None on record
DENIS WILSON Trustee
None on record
IAN ARTHUR STOCKLEY Trustee
None on record
IAN DOUGLAS FISHER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 10/12/2019 10/12/2020 10/12/2021 10/12/2022 10/12/2023
Total gross income £4.93k £6.09k £5.32k £7.05k £15.09k
Total expenditure £886 £1.82k £1.79k £2.83k £10.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 December 2023 15 October 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2022 24 November 2023 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2021 11 October 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2020 25 April 2022 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 December 2019 13 November 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SENTINEL HOUSE
PEASHOLME GREEN
YORK
YO1 7PP
Phone:
01904716000
Website:

No information available