FLEXERCISE WLHB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the training of teachers in Bagot Stack system of exercise to enable them to set up and teach FLexercise classes around the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 March 1964: Standard registration
- THE FITNESS LEAGUE (Working name)
- THE WOMEN'S LEAGUE OF HEALTH AND BEAUTY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Innes Margaret Milne | Chair | 03 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Margaret Gronow | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Kathryn Berry | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Stevenson | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Magaret Peggie OBE | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Floyd | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.60k | £62.29k | £48.03k | £54.15k | £58.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.60k | £111.66k | £47.88k | £56.49k | £63.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/10/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/03/1975 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/03/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/03/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/1999 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2016 as amended on 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE HEALTH, PHYSICAL FITNESS, EDUCATION AND TRAINING THROUGH THE TEACHING OF THE BAGOT STACK EXERCISE SYSTEM BY MEANS OF HOLDING CLASSES, AND DELIVERY OF LECTURES, EVENTS AND CONFERENCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC; (B) TO RECRUIT AND TRAIN TEACHERS, TRAINERS AND ASSESSORS TO BE QUALIFIED IN THE BEGOT STACK EXERCISE SYSTEM (C) TO PROVIDE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT TRAINING AND COURSES FOR TEACHERS AND TRAINERS AND ASSESSORS OF THE BAGOT STACK EXERCISE SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
W L H B
PO Box 6981
BASINGSTOKE
RG24 4GH
- Phone:
- 01256327014
- Email:
- hello@fl-exercise.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window