SCARBOROUGH TRINITY HOUSE SEAFARERS' TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide almshouse accomodation, in the form of 25 one bedroomed flats across 2 sites in Scarborough, to persons of limited means. Principally retired seafarers and their dependents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 October 1963: Standard registration
- SCARBOROUGH TRINITY HOUSE MERCHANT SEAMEN'S HOME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAPTAIN PETER HOLTBY | Chair |
|
||||||
FREDERICK NORMANDALE | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|||||
GEOFF KELL | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Robinson | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN RAY TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN MARTIN DONNELLY | Trustee | 28 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Captain John Dyson | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ARNOLD LOCKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPTAIN MN STEPHEN ROGER KENINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.48k | £93.08k | £88.19k | £95.97k | £107.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.69k | £77.62k | £83.13k | £76.71k | £83.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 4 JUNE 1971, SCHEME OF 2 OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
1 MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMSHOUSE. 2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMS PEOPLE OF THE CHARITY (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Newlands Park Grove
Scarborough
YO12 6PT
- Phone:
- 01723379910
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window