THE ROBERT HILL AND NOBLE STREET CHARITY

Charity number: 226135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

There is no longer an MURC presence in Wem. The Trustees are in correspondence with the Charity Commission

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £3,645
Total expenditure: £1,960

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1964: Standard registration
  • 13 January 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 13 January 2012: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NOBLE STREET CHAPEL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER BROOMHALL Chair 18 February 2019
None on record
David Waghorn Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
PAUL JOHNSON Trustee 24 February 2020
SHROPSHIRE & MARCHES METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Alwyn Thomas Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rosemary Dodd Cclr Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES WILTON-MORGAN Trustee 22 March 2013
None on record
SYLVIA MARGARET STARKEY Trustee 16 April 2012
None on record
MANDY MEAKIN Trustee
THE WEM SPORTS AND SOCIAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROGER ASHTON PHF Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.41k £3.58k £3.35k £3.24k £3.65k
Total expenditure £1.55k £2.00k £1.90k £1.84k £1.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 August 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 02 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES DATED 22 OCTOBER 1886 AND 3 JANUARY 1913. RESOLUTIONS MADE UNDER SECTION 74C OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 22 JULY 2011 AND 10 OCTOBER 2011.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ANY SCHOOL IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEM BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THAT SCHOOL. TO ASSIST PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEM TO TAKE UP AN APPRENTICESHIP OR UNDERTAKE TRAINING FOR A TRADE OR OCCUPATION. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF WEM BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WEM
Registration history
  • 02 March 1964 : Standard registration
  • 13 January 2012 : Removed
  • 13 January 2012 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
18 SUMMERFIELD ROAD
WEM
SHREWSBURY
SY4 5BW
Phone:
01939232140
Website:

No information available