NACRO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We believe that everyone deserves a good education, a safe place to live and the chance to start again, with support from someone on their side. Our housing, education, justice and health services work alongside people to give them the support and skills they need to succeed. We fight for voices to be heard and campaign to create lasting change. We see your future, whatever the past.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£77,060,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £77.03m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £28.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£77,325,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £77.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £56,763,000 from 58 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £77.33m |
People

793 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 11 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- NACRO (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE AND RESETTLEMENT OF OFFENDERS (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Lionel Harwick | Chair | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Oldmeadow | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Walker | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Main Langellier | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Oswald | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maneer Afsar | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Mary Dickens | Trustee | 18 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shamaila Farrah Mailk | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Kaseem | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Frost | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Spence | Trustee | 22 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNN EMSLIE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.34m | £60.70m | £66.82m | £68.66m | £77.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.25m | £58.99m | £65.76m | £69.66m | £77.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £40.65m | £34.18m | £36.50m | £50.20m | £56.76m | |
|
Income from government grants | £135.85k | £155.00k | £150.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £63.34m | £60.70m | £0 | £68.66m | £77.03m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £28.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £28.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £66.82m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £64.25m | £58.99m | £65.76m | £69.66m | £77.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £812.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £24.16m | £23.04m | £22.45m | £21.76m | £21.20m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £15.43m | £16.54m | £18.37m | £17.55m | £17.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£16.95m | -£16.96m | -£14.50m | -£13.63m | -£13.05m | |
|
Total liabilities | £15.35m | £13.94m | £15.24m | £15.60m | £15.54m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4/2/1925, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19/10/1960, 11/3/1966, 8/4/1972, 20/9/1974, 21/7/1975, 20/7/1977, 15/11/1999, AND 13/12/2004. as amended on 24 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE CARE AND RESETTLEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF OFFENDERS, AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING, AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS; 2. TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS AND METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF CRIME, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND DELINQUENCY AND TO OBTAIN AND MAKE RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME; 3. TO PROVIDE, PROMOTE, SUPPORT OR ORGANISE THE RECRUITMENT AND TRAINING OF ANY OFFENDER, AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING, AND TO ASSIST THEM IN FINDING EMPLOYMENT AND ACCOMMODATION AND TO REHABILITATE THEMSELVES 4. TO PROMOTE SUPPORT OR CARRY ON EITHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY OTHER BODY AUTHORITY OR PERSON ANY PROJECT OR SCHEME IN CONNECTION WITH ANY METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND TO PROVIDE MONEY FOR SUCH PURPOSES WHETHER BY LOAN OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- BIRKIN TRUST
- FRANK FOSTER FUND
- HOLDING FUND
- JOYCE GODDARD'S PRISON CHARITY
- LANCASTER D P A FUND
- NACRO CHARITY FOR PRISONERS AND FAMILIES OF SERVING AND DISCHARGED PRISONERS
- NAVAL COURT-MARTIAL FUND
- NEWTON FUND
- PENNELL (SOUTHERN RHODESIA) FUND
- PRISONERS CHILDRENS CHRISTMAS FUND
- REYNOLDS FUND
- SPECIAL PURPOSES FUND
- ST LEONARDS FUND
- WILTSHIRE D P A FUND
- WIVES AND FAMILIES FUND
- WORCESTERSHIRE D P A FUND
- YORK CASTLE D P A FUND
- 08 July 1964 : Standard registration
- 12 February 2001 : Removed
- 12 February 2001 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
N A C R O
Walkden House
16-17 Devonshire Square
LONDON
EC2M 4SQ
- Phone:
- 0300 123 1889
- Email:
- abbass.shah@nacro.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window