THE CHURCH ARMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a mission-focused community of people transforming lives and neighbourhoods through the work of evangelists, staff and volunteers. We are committed to sharing the Christian faith through words and action in a variety of contexts across the British Isles and Ireland. Our evangelists and staff work beyond church buildings among some of the most broken, rejected and hurting people in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£7,284,000
Donations and legacies | £3.24m | |
Charitable activities | £3.08m | |
Other trading activities | £434.00k | |
Investments | £462.00k | |
Other | £61.00k |
Total expenditure:
£11,147,000
Raising funds | £1.84m | |
Charitable activities | £9.25m | |
Other | £57.00k |
-£60,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £494,000 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.89m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.25m |
People

194 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
560 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 May 1967: Standard registration
- 07 April 2005: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- CHURCH ARMY (Working name)
- PORTMAN HOUSE TRUST (Working name)
- THE MARYLEBONE PROJECT (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Homes England
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Revd Dr Gulnar Eleanor Francis-Dehqani | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Rev Andrew James Forster | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew George Barlow | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Amy Hayes | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Malayil Lukose Varghese Muthalaly | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Kerry Preston | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Solomon Osagie | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Russell | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Karen Webb | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ravi Gidoomal | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Karen West | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Captain Andrew Payne CA | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John David Whitfield MA ACA | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00m | £6.35m | £6.37m | £6.12m | £7.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18m | £7.63m | £8.72m | £10.02m | £11.15m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £515.00k | £443.00k | £455.00k | £466.00k | £494.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.00k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.25m | £2.79m | £2.83m | £2.32m | £3.24m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £376.00k | £30.00k | £179.00k | £400.00k | £434.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.75m | £2.68m | £2.79m | £2.89m | £3.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £586.00k | £575.00k | £502.00k | £467.00k | £462.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £40.00k | £278.00k | £73.00k | £42.00k | £61.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £774.00k | £728.00k | £428.00k | £260.00k | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.75m | £6.46m | £7.42m | £8.48m | £9.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.43m | £1.17m | £1.28m | £1.50m | £1.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £67.00k | £43.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £24.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £271.00k | £265.00k | £142.00k | £148.00k | £412.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | £44.00k | £57.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.75m | £8.86m | £20.79m | £8.68m | £8.43m | |
|
Long-term investments | £20.74m | £21.36m | £8.71m | £16.40m | £12.20m | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £1.07m | £1.53m | £1.12m | £1.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£259.00k | -£636.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.17m | £1.13m | £1.01m | £619.00k | £830.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5TH JULY 1955, 21ST MAY 1990, 22ND NOVEMBER 2002, 17TH NOVEMBER 2005 AND 27TH NOVEMBER 2008 as amended on 22 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO BRING PEOPLE TO A PERSONAL FAITH IN JESUS CHRIST BY (A) PROVIDING TRAINED EVANGELISTS AND LAY AGENTS TO ASSIST THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, (B) PREACHING THE NEED OF CONVERSION, HOLINESS OF LIFE AND CHURCH MEMBERSHIP, (C) RELIEVING POVERTY AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- AGNES TENNANT BEQUEST
- AIMEE CONSTANCE ANNE LOWTHER
- ALFRED THOMAS SMITH BEQUEST
- BED ENDOWMENTS FUND I
- BED ENDOWMENTS FUND II
- BED ENDOWMENTS FUND III
- BEQUEST OF JOHN DOCTOR YOUNG
- CAPTAIN A J GRAY TRUST
- CATHERINE SARAH JANE PATTESON HOLIDAY FUND
- CECILIA GRACE CANNON FUND FOR DISABLED SOLDIERS
- CHARLES F OPENSHAW TRUST
- CHARLES JOHN BYRNE BEQUEST
- CONSTANCE E WHITE TRUST
- COURTMOOR HOME OF REST, CROOKHAM
- DONALD BATES CHARITY
- E I M DUNCOMBE ENDOWMENT
- EDGAR FIGGESS BEQUEST
- ELEANOR GODFREY CRITTALL
- ELIZABETH JANE HARTLEY
- FLORENCE LUCY BECKETT BEQUEST
- GEORGE WILLIAM NORTON BEQUEST
- GEORGIANA FRANCES PACKE FUND
- H J WILKINS TRUST
- HERBERT TOBIAS SCHARRER
- J F HOWES BEQUEST
- JAMES LLEWELLYN SHEFFIELD BEQUEST
- JOHN CROSSE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
- JOHN DYER BEQUEST
- LADY SITWELL'S CHARITY
- LORD CHARLES F BRUDENELL-BRUCE BEQUEST
- MAJOR H W ROWDEN'S GIFT
- MISS A G JEWELL BEQUEST
- MISS ANN NEWTON BEQUEST
- MISS CARR ENDOWMENT
- MISS E SCHOFIELD JACKSON BEQUEST
- MISS EDITH DUNNING ENDOWMENT
- MISS ETHEL JULIAN GALE BEQUEST
- MISS EVELYN MURIEL BARNETT FOR THE CHURCH ARMY
- MISS EVELYN MURIEL BARNETT FOR THE CHURCH ARMY
- MISS FLORENCE STRANGER TRUST
- MISS GERTRUDE STEPHENSON FOR THE CHURCH ARMY
- MISS J E LAVERS-SMITH TRUST
- MISS J G WATSON TRUST
- MISS L A HARRIS TRUST
- MISS L I LEGGE BEQUEST
- MISS M K D S LOCKHART TRUST
- MISS MARY ELLEN HEARN
- MR AND MRS A W VIVIAN-NEAL TRUST
- MRS A M HOWE TRUST
- MRS E M L O'HARA BEQUEST
- MRS G HOLT SKINNER TRUST
- MRS HAMILTON COBB TRUST
- MRS MOYLE-STEWART TRUST
- NIGHT SHELTERS (GILES HAWORTH IN MEMORY OF HIS SISTERS ELLEN, DINAH AND ELIZABETH HAWORTH)
- PORTMAN HOUSE
- PROCEEDS OF SALE OF THE CHURCH ARMY HOSTEL, PLYMOUTH
- R G HALL TRUST
- REVEREND JOHN PARRY MORGAN BEQUEST
- ROGER LYON JONES TRUST FUND
- ST MICHAEL'S HOME FOR MOTHERLESS GIRLS
- T W ARMSTRONG BEQUEST
- THE CONSTANCE BEERBOHM FUND
- THE EDWARD AND LILLIAN EMILY BUDGEN (OF EGHAM) TRUST
- THERESA STANSFIELD KENNEDY HOME OF REST FUND
- WILLIAM R J KENTON BED ENDOWMENT FUND
- 15 May 1967 : Standard registration
- 07 April 2005 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ARMY
WILSON CARLILE CENTRE
50 CAVENDISH STREET
SHEFFIELD
S3 7RZ
- Phone:
- 03001232113
- Email:
- robin.webb@churcharmy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window