Accounts and annual returns TRUST FUND HELD IN CONNECTION WITH CANONS REGULAR OF THE IMMACULATE CONCEPTION

Charity number: 226242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 April 2023 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 April 2023 161 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 January 2023 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 January 2023 454 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 January 2023 819 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 January 2023 819 days late Download Open in new window