THE OXFORD GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our programmes are varied but include initiatives to develop sustainable communities; making films about conflict resolution; working to bring trust and integrity into the business and financial sectors; helping young people to find a sense of vocation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 1964: Standard registration
- INITIATIVES OF CHANGE-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Gutteridge | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rhoderick Edwards | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee | 31 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joi McAtee | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lul Seyoum | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Corcoran | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Boobbyer | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Doherty | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22m | £1.09m | £797.58k | £614.36k | £371.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62m | £1.89m | £2.02m | £2.11m | £2.22m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £379.02k | £581.43k | £334.99k | £152.58k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £245.64k | £109.09k | £103.79k | £139.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.24k | £829 | £588 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £589.84k | £374.46k | £358.22k | £322.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £505 | £22.71k | £0 | £32 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £25.51k | £493.12k | £295.95k | £122.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.40m | £1.65m | £1.73m | £1.84m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.26k | £238.34k | £287.03k | £269.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £116.53k | £82.25k | £44.52k | £124.66k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £150.00k | £58.38k | £62.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £19.05k | £35.84k | £71.37k | £62.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £200.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/1939 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2012 as amended on 16 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE MEANS AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE OXFORD GROUP MOVEMENT FOUNDED IN OR ABOUT THE YEAR 1921 BY FRANK NATHAN DANIEL BUCHMAN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OXFORD GROUP
24 GREENCOAT PLACE
LONDON
SW1P 1RD
- Phone:
- 02077986000
- Email:
- uk@iofc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window