THE LODGE OF PROBITY NO 61 BICENTENARY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 226382
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Masonic Charity specifically related to The Lodge of Probity No. 61. Halifax

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £199
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Eric Roslyn Anthony Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Alex Baskeyfield Trustee 26 March 2018
None on record
MR IAN FIRTH Trustee
SKELMANTHORPE COTTAGE HOMES
Received: 3 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56 £21 £4 £42 £199
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 August 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WOODLEY
BUSKER LANE
SKELMANTHORPE
HUDDERSFIELD
WEST YORKSHIRE
HD8 9EP
Phone:
01484862417
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available