Financial history THURNBY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 226387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.06k £29.83k £37.78k £27.46k £33.62k
Total expenditure £44.98k £15.40k £41.19k £20.25k £36.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.38k £23.00k £12.67k N/A £1.39k