Financial history TRAFFORD MENCAP

Charity number: 226413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £72.69k £107.15k £164.00k £52.44k £57.91k
Total expenditure £56.60k £32.10k £35.00k £27.70k £40.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A