THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ORMSKIRK HOSPITALS GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The League of Friends raises money to purchase equipment for Ormskirk and Southport hospitals for patient care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 February 1964: Standard registration
- 07 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 March 2022: Funds transferred to 1049227 SOUTHPORT AND ORMSKIRK HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITAB...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.54k | £2.15k | £26.97k | £49.02k | £7.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.52k | £31.47k | £12.86k | £23.34k | £38.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 10 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 13 September 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED NOVEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE ORMSKIRK HOSPITALS GROUP BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SEVICE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION AND RULES)
Area of benefit
ORMSKIRK AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window