Accounts and annual returns THE PRITT FUND FOR RELIEF OF LIVERPOOL SOLICITORS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS

Charity number: 226421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 14 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required