Accounts and annual returns RIPON AND LEEDS DIOCESAN COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID

Charity number: 226437
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 08 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 13 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 13 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required