THE MRA PRODUCTIONS FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 July 1964: Standard registration
- 16 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15k | £1.19k | £1.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £719 | £1.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 27 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 27 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 02 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/8/1949 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSE, WITH SPECIAL APPLICATION TO THE PURPOSE OF PRODUCING AND EXHIBITING SUCH STAGE AND RADIO PLAYS, REVUES AND FILM AND PUBLISHING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AS SHALL BE REQUIRED FOR THE WORK OF PROCURING UNIVERSAL ACCEPTANCE AND APPLICATION OF THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window