FAULKBOURNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintainance of the village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 15 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHARLES PHILLIPS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Fisher | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|||||
HELEN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Fisher | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
ANDREW ROBERT WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE HICKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER JEAN BREWSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.24k | £4.72k | £6.32k | £5.83k | £8.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £2.71k | £3.57k | £10.22k | £12.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 July 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 September 2021 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JUNE 1949. AND SCHEME OF THE 27TH AUGUST 1975
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT MEETING PLACE FOR ALL THE VILLAGE SOCIETIES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FAULKBOURNE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAULKBOURNE HALL
FAULKBOURNE
WITHAM
CM8 1SP
- Phone:
- 07956639877
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window