Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BURY OLDHAM AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 226624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Diane Peart Chair 16 June 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BURY AND OLDHAM BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Suzanne Lunn Trustee 25 June 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BURY AND OLDHAM BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Karen Jakeman Trustee 31 August 2021
None on record
Sandra Mary Paterson Trustee 17 June 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BURY AND OLDHAM BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Christopher Peart Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
David Haigh Trustee 20 April 2013
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BURY AND OLDHAM BRANCH CIO
Recently registered