ELIZA MARTHA BELL REST FUND

Charity number: 226634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principle activity of the charity is the provision of recuperative holidays for Christian women workers of the Protestant faith, being persons of limited means who require rest from some active missionary work or other Christian service.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £32,325
Total expenditure: £43,574

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 September 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ELIZA MARTHA BELL HOME OF REST FOR LADIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SIMON JOHNATHAN EYRE Chair
None on record
Stephen David Francis Trustee 01 December 2021
TRANSFORMING HEALTH AND EDUCATION IN NEPAL
Received: On time
VICTORIA BAPTIST CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
MARK ALAN SMITH Trustee 19 September 2012
None on record
GRETA MARY DE WIRTZ Trustee
None on record
MR RAY DADSWELL Trustee
None on record
MR TIM FIRTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.27k £25.90k £29.31k £34.67k £32.33k
Total expenditure £40.79k £40.15k £22.46k £48.16k £43.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 December 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 December 2021 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 February 2021 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 February 2021 110 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
92 Denbigh Street
London
SW1V 2EX
Phone:
02078216226
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available