Financial history THE ROBERT MCALPINE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 226646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £826.58k £712.48k £834.26k £1.03m £971.30k
Total expenditure £722.72k £755.37k £703.57k £715.01k £755.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £90.91k £100.00k £136.36k £136.36k £100.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £734.01k £612.48k £697.90k £892.15k £871.30k
Income - Other £1.66k £0 £0 £3.64k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £635.38k £648.96k £629.34k £633.00k £656.13k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.83k £28.38k £30.91k £28.00k £30.85k
Expenditure - Governance £3.30k £3.36k £3.54k £3.90k £7.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £632.08k £645.60k £625.80k £629.10k £648.90k
Expenditure - Investment management £30.83k £28.38k £30.91k £28.00k £30.85k
Expenditure - Other £56.51k £78.03k £43.32k £54.02k £68.45k