SCARCROFT INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Community Hall. Used for educational classes. Women's Institute. Parish Council Meetings. Public Meetings. Various Committee Meetings. Election Polling Station. Annual Village Flower Show and meetings. Local childrens parties and general local hire. The only voluntary community facility in Scarcroft Established 1924.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 May 1964: Standard registration
- SCARCROFT VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA GOODALL | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SCARCROFT PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN ARNOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL S SWAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.25k | £11.08k | £7.61k | £11.86k | £10.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.49k | £7.03k | £6.78k | £9.66k | £12.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DECEMBER 1923 AND RULES AS REVISED 27 APRIL 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCARCROFT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, SEX OR RELIGIOUS OPINION.
Area of benefit
SCARCROFT AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELTOFTS FARM
CARR LANE
THORNER
LEEDS
LS14 3HF
- Phone:
- 01132892258
- Email:
- goodallfawcus@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window