THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - CORPORATE BODY

Charity number: 226686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of welfare support to members of the Royal Air Forces community. The Association's welfare activities include the operation of three respite care homes, provision of sheltered housing, assistance for individuals in welfare need, support to the serving RAF through contributions to Contact Houses and Internet Cafes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Barbados
  • Belgium
  • Cyprus
  • Falkland Islands
  • France
  • Germany
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Guernsey
  • Hong Kong
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Jersey
  • Luxembourg
  • Malta
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Northern Ireland
  • Norway
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Switzerland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1995: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RAFA (Working name)
  • THE RAF ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Air Vice Marshal Alastair Reid Chair 23 October 2022
None on record
Air Cdre Lee Turner Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
David Ruxton Garrow Forsyth Trustee 19 October 2024
None on record
Sqn Ldr Micah Aopare Trustee 21 February 2024
None on record
Sheila Bailey Trustee 21 February 2024
THE JOCKEYS EDUCATION AND TRAINING SCHEME
Received: On time
Flt Lt Simon Arnett Trustee 14 October 2023
ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION SALISBURY AND BOSCOMBE DOWN BRANCH
Recently registered
Sally Munday Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Raymond Frank Blunden Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Margaret Greer Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
Martin Watkins Trustee 23 October 2022
Royal Air Forces Association - Manchester & District Branch
Received: On time
Warrant Officer Michelle Rees-Martin Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
MARK NEAL Trustee 21 February 2018
None on record
FIONA BARBER Trustee 22 November 2017
None on record
Air Marshal Sir Barry Mark North Trustee 14 May 2016
None on record
Pauline Bearblock Trustee 14 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.24m £13.92m £12.51m £12.56m £16.23m
Total expenditure £17.21m £17.24m £14.35m £15.91m £17.70m
Income from government contracts £419.33k £373.77k £461.71k £461.71k £468.26k
Income from government grants N/A £1.19m £397.55k £123 £300.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.46m £5.70m £5.81m £1.69m £2.67m
Income - Other trading activities £1.53m £1.48m £1.60m £972.00k £1.00m
Income - Charitable activities £4.23m £5.88m £4.52m £6.39m £2.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.02m £864.00k £577.00k £662.00k £564.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.84m £9.32m
Income - Legacies £4.27m £2.89m £2.16m £986.00k £1.36m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.60m £14.82m £12.66m £13.94m £15.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.21m £2.14m £1.66m £1.97m £2.08m
Expenditure - Governance £815.00k £359.00k £236.00k £402.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £275.00k £533.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £119.00k £118.00k £122.00k £14.00k £619.00k
Expenditure - Other £401.00k £276.00k £30.00k £4.00k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £8.58m £8.74m £7.29m £6.27m £24.88m
Long-term investments £26.91m £22.81m £25.39m £21.60m £2.28m
Other assets £4.71m £5.80m £5.29m £3.75m £4.51m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£430.00k -£830.00k £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £4.05m £4.51m £4.40m £4.22m £4.59m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 30 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE RICHARD PECK CONVALESCENT HOME AND THE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS THEREOF. 2) IN THE EVENT OF THE RICHARD PECK HOME CEASING TO FUNCTION THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARE TO USED FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF RAFA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 October 1995 : Standard registration
  • 09 September 2020 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Atlas House
41 Wembley Road
Leicester
LE3 1UT
Phone:
0800 018 2361