Financial history BRIERLEY HILL AND BROCKMOOR OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 226707
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £1.68k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.36k £0 £0 £0 £3.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A