SOUTHAMPTON MIND
Charity Number: 226730
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 April 1962: Standard registration
- 12 December 2001: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 December 2001: Funds transferred to 1081116 SOLENT MIND
Organisation type:
Other names:
- SOUTHAMPTON AND DISTRICT MIND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 1962 AS AMENDED 8TH MAY 1980 AND 3RD AUGUST 1989.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MENTAL HEALTH AND TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING AND REHABILITATING PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER OR IN CONDITIONS OF EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS REQUIRING ADVICE OR TREATMENT,IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOUTHAMPTON AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.