Trustees THE GENERAL SERVICE BOARD OF ALCOHOLICS ANONYMOUS (GREAT BRITAIN) LIMITED
Charity number: 226745

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Stafford Newton | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Roberta Tolfrey Dr | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syed Hassan Abbas Zaidi | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Warren Muelchi | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Murdoch Duncan | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Sheridan | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Mark Stephens | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carmel Mary Zita George | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Elizabeth Jefferies | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Sarah Alexander | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Gipson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrina Cassidy | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charon Bourke | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Hamish McSwan | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kieran John Moriarty | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zelma Irene Kesans | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim John Barker | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Coady | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Levente Gabor Patocs | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Faul | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gretchen Swisher | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.