THE BRITISH HUNGARIAN FELLOWSHIP LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Fellowship was and remains to foster friendship and understanding between the people of Britain and Hungary through the organising of meetings to discuss topics of mutual interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hungary
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- 26 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £412 | £710 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01k | £351 | £634 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 22 May 2008 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 24 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 22 May 2008 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 24 April 2008 | 360 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 21 July 2005 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 29TH MARCH 1963 AS AMENDED ON THE 6TH DECEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND OF HUNGARIANS LIVING IN GREAT BRITAIN BY FOSTERING THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS OF HUNGARY AND OF THE HUNGARIAN LANGUAGE AND BY FOSTERING AMONG HUNGARIANS LIVING IN GREAT BRITAIN THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SUFFERING AMONG HUNGARIANS IN HUNGARY.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND HUNGARY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window