THE NATIONAL SWEET PEA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the society are to disseminate knowledge of sweet peas and other lathyrus species for the public benefit, to encourage, improve and extend the cultivation of these species by means of scientific trials, the holding of exhibitions and displays, by publications and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Japan
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Alison Shreeve | Chair | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Morgan | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Burrell | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Hollingdale | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Tate | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Johnson | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE BALL | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PARSONS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.74k | £12.76k | £19.61k | £20.37k | £23.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.98k | £12.69k | £22.78k | £19.52k | £24.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES REVISED DECEMBER 1954 AND 12 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
TO DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE OF SWEET PEAS AND OTHER LATHYRUS SPECIES, TO ENCOURAGE, IMPROVE AND EXTEND THE CULTIVATION OF THESE FLOWERS BY MEANS OF SCIENTIFIC TRIALS THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS AND DISPLAYS, BY PUBLICATIONS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Lime Grove
CHORLEY
PR7 3JA
- Phone:
- 07961477137
- Email:
- caroletate10@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window