Trustees LAYCOCK VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 226807

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Andrew Wiltshire | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
jessica curley | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Gillatt | Trustee | 04 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary belfield Parker | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Teresa Austin | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Pickard | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Ferrier | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN CARTWRIGHT | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BIRDSALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.