EAST MEON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Use of hall for village activities, including PCC meetings, mother & toddler, nursery & pre-school, pilates, yoga, karate, flower show, history club, cafe, parties, dog shows, weddings, film shows and country fair.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 June 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David McKenzie Pepper | Chair | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matt Millward | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Iremonger | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.06k | £17.95k | £31.99k | £42.03k | £39.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.48k | £21.01k | £34.29k | £45.14k | £48.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.91k | N/A | £5.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 September 2023 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28TH APRIL 1970 AS AFFECTED BY A SCHEME OF 4TH JULY 1973 AS AMENDED AT THE AGM OF 14 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF EAST MEON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST MEON
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Meon Village Hall
Workhouse Lane
East Meon
Petersfield
Hampshire
GU32 1PF
- Phone:
- 07956 783 061
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window